TN SB0008 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on December 13 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-06 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate F,W&M Revenue Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 13 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-06 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate F,W&M Revenue Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, eliminates the amusement tax on health clubs and fitness facilities; eliminates the amusement tax exemption for certain health clubs and fitness facilities. - Amends TCA Section 67-6-212 and Section 67-6-330.
Title
As introduced, eliminates the amusement tax on health clubs and fitness facilities; eliminates the amusement tax exemption for certain health clubs and fitness facilities. - Amends TCA Section 67-6-212 and Section 67-6-330.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-06 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate F,W&M Revenue Subcommittee |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee calendar for 3/6/2019 |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Refer to Senate F,W&M Revenue Subcommittee |
2019-01-19 | Senate | Refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2019-01-09 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, Held on desk pending committee appointments |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-12-13 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0005 (Crossfiled) 2019-02-20 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee