TN HB0005 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on November 14 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-20 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, eliminates the amusement tax on health clubs and fitness facilities; eliminates the amusement tax exemption for certain health clubs and fitness facilities. - Amends TCA Section 67-6-212 and Section 67-6-330.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, eliminates the amusement tax on health clubs and fitness facilities; eliminates the amusement tax exemption for certain health clubs and fitness facilities. - Amends TCA Section 67-6-212 and Section 67-6-330.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-20HouseTaken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2019-02-13HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 2/20/2019
2019-01-22HouseAssigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
2019-01-10HouseRef. to Finance, Ways & Means
2019-01-09HouseP2C held on desk.
2019-01-08HouseIntro., P1C.
2018-11-14HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0008 (Crossfiled) 2019-03-06 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate F,W&M Revenue Subcommittee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback