TN SB0005 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 18 2008 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-02-09 - Ref. to S. S&L Gov. Comm.
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 18 2008 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-02-09 - Ref. to S. S&L Gov. Comm.
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires identification and proof of citizenship for voter registration; requires a voter to present qualified photographic identification before voting; voters without proper identification shall be allowed to cast provisional ballots. - Amends TCA Title 2, Chapter 2 and Title 2, Chapter 7.
Title
As introduced, requires identification and proof of citizenship for voter registration; requires a voter to present qualified photographic identification before voting; voters without proper identification shall be allowed to cast provisional ballots. - Amends TCA Title 2, Chapter 2 and Title 2, Chapter 7.
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Ketron [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-02-09 | Ref. to S. S&L Gov. Comm. | |
2009-01-14 | P2C held on desk pending committee appointments | |
2009-01-13 | Intro., P1C. | |
2008-12-18 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB0010 (Crossfiled) 2009-02-11 - Assigned to s/c Elections of S&LG
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB0005&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/SB0005.pdf |