TN SB0005 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on November 12 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-13 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, allows a volunteer firefighter to receive $800 from the commission on firefighting personnel standards and education for completing 40 hours of training annually. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 24.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4, Chapter 24, relative to volunteer firefighters.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-13SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
2021-01-12SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2020-11-12SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0365 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-23 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Cities & Counties Subcommittee of Local Government Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback