TN HR0156 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-01 - Signed by H. Speaker
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-01 - Signed by H. Speaker
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Approves amendments and revisions to Tennessee rules of appellate procedure promulgated by the supreme court.
Title
Approves amendments and revisions to Tennessee rules of appellate procedure promulgated by the supreme court.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-31 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-27 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Consent Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-19 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CIVIL JUSTICE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Civil Justice Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-27 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Consent Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-19 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CIVIL JUSTICE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Civil Justice Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-01 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2014-04-01 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2014-03-31 | House | Adopted, Ayes 94, Nays 0, PNV 1 |
2014-03-27 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 3/31/2014 |
2014-03-26 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/27/2014 |
2014-03-20 | House | Action Def. in Calendar & Rules Committee to 3/27/2014 |
2014-03-19 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/20/2014 |
2014-03-19 | House | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee |
2014-03-12 | House | Placed on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 3/19/2014 |
2014-02-20 | House | Intro., ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2014-02-18 | House | Filed for intro. |