TN HR0154 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Signed by H. Speaker
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Signed by H. Speaker
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Tennessee Paddlesports Association
Title
A RESOLUTION to recognize the Tennessee Paddlesports Association.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-18 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-18 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2024-04-18 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2024-04-18 | House | Adopted, Ayes 93, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2024-04-17 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-04-16 | House | Intro., placed on H. consent cal. for 4/17/2024 |
2024-04-16 | House | Filed for introduction |