TN HR0068 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-02 - Signed by H. Speaker
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-02 - Signed by H. Speaker
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Harrison D. McIver III
Title
Harrison D. McIver III
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-01 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-02 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2019-04-02 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2019-04-01 | House | Adopted, Ayes 94, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2019-03-28 | House | Intro., placed on H. consent cal. for 4/1/19 |
2019-03-26 | House | Filed for introduction |