TN HR0025 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Failed on March 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-09 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Failed on March 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-09 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Calls on President Donald J. Trump not to rescind sanctions against Russia.
Title
Calls on President Donald J. Trump not to rescind sanctions against Russia.
Sponsors
Rep. Bo Mitchell [D] | Rep. Larry Miller [D] | Rep. Mike Stewart [D] | Rep. Joe Towns [D] |
Rep. Craig Fitzhugh [D] | Rep. Antonio Parkinson [D] | Rep. G.A. Hardaway [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-09 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-03-08 | House | Failed for lack of second in: State Government Subcommittee |
2017-03-01 | House | Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 3/8/2017 |
2017-02-14 | House | Assigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee |
2017-02-13 | House | Intro., ref. to State Government Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | Filed for intro. |