TN HJR1385 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 29 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - Signed by H. Speaker
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 29 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - Signed by H. Speaker
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Buddy Clark Leach II
Title
A RESOLUTION to recognize and honor Buddy Clark Leach II of Huntingdon.
Sponsors
Rep. Ron Gant [R] | Rep. Brock Martin [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-22 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-18 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-18 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-29 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2024-04-29 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Concurred, Ayes 28, Nays 0 |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Received from House, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar for 4/22/2024 |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-04-18 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2024-04-18 | House | Adopted, Ayes 93, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2024-04-16 | House | Intro., placed on H. consent cal. for 4/17/2024 |
2024-04-16 | House | Filed for introduction |