TN HJR1193 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-12 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-12 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Ethan Hosea, Salutatorian, Hardin County High School
Title
Ethan Hosea, Salutatorian, Hardin County High School
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-05-10 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-12 | Signed by Governor. | |
2010-05-11 | Transmitted to Governor for his action. | |
2010-05-11 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2010-05-11 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2010-05-11 | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. | |
2010-05-10 | Concurred, Ayes 32, Nays 0 | |
2010-05-07 | Placed on Sen. Consent Calendar (1) cal. for 05/10/2010 | |
2010-05-06 | Rcvd. from H., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. | |
2010-05-05 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. | |
2010-05-05 | Adopted, Ayes 94, Nays 1 | |
2010-05-04 | H. Placed on Tentative Consent Calendar for 5/05/10 | |
2010-05-04 | Reset on Tentative Consent cal. for 5/05/10 | |
2010-04-29 | Intro., placed on H. consent cal. 5/03/10 | |
2010-04-29 | Filed for intro. |