TN HJR1173 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-09 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-09 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Dr. Denise Sibley
Title
A RESOLUTION to honor and commend Dr. Denise Sibley for her exemplary service to the State of Tennessee.
Sponsors
Rep. Susan Lynn [R] | Rep. Jerry Sexton [R] | Rep. Bud Hulsey [R] | Rep. Tim Hicks [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-27 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 71 N: 18 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 71 N: 18 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-09 | Signed by Governor. | |
2022-05-04 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2022-05-03 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2022-05-02 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2022-05-02 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Concurred, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 3 for 4/27/2022 |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Received from House, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2022-04-26 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2022-04-25 | House | Adopted, Ayes 71, Nays 18, PNV 2 |
2022-04-25 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-04-22 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-04-21 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/25/22 |
2022-04-21 | House | Objected to on Consent Calendar. |
2022-04-21 | House | Intro., placed on H. consent cal. #2 for 4/21/22 |
2022-04-19 | House | Filed for introduction |