TN HJR1131 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-09 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-09 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Peter Eric O'Hare
Title
A RESOLUTION to honor the memory of Peter Eric O'Hare.
Sponsors
Rep. Greg Martin [R] | Rep. Yusuf Hakeem [D] | Rep. Patsy Hazlewood [R] | Rep. Esther Helton-Haynes [R] |
Rep. Greg Vital [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-01 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-25 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-25 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-09 | Signed by Governor. | |
2024-04-04 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2024-04-03 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2024-04-03 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2024-04-01 | Senate | Concurred, Ayes 30, Nays 0 |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar for 4/1/2024 |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Received from House, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-03-26 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2024-03-25 | House | Adopted, Ayes 95, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2024-03-21 | House | Intro., placed on H. consent cal. for 3/25/2024 |
2024-03-20 | House | Filed for introduction |