TN HJR1018 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-17 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-17 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Karen Franklin, Senator Douglas Henry Award for Service to Children and Families at Risk
Title
Karen Franklin, Senator Douglas Henry Award for Service to Children and Families at Risk
Sponsors
Rep. Joe Pitts [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-11 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-04 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-04 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-17 | Signed by Governor. | |
2018-04-12 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2018-04-11 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2018-04-11 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Concurred, Ayes 33, Nays 0 |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar calendar for 4/11/2018 |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Received from House, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2018-04-04 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2018-04-04 | House | Adopted, Ayes 80, Nays 0, PNV 2 |
2018-04-02 | House | Intro., placed on H. consent cal. for 4-4-18 |
2018-04-02 | House | Filed for intro. |