TN HJR0898 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-24 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-24 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Faith Promise Church, 15th anniversary
Title
Faith Promise Church, 15th anniversary
Sponsors
Rep. Ryan Haynes [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-03-22 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-24 | Signed by Governor. | |
2010-03-23 | Transmitted to Governor for his action. | |
2010-03-23 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2010-03-23 | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. | |
2010-03-23 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2010-03-22 | Concurred, Ayes 33, Nays 0 | |
2010-03-18 | Placed on Sen. Consent Calendar (1) cal. for 03/22/2010 | |
2010-03-17 | Rcvd. from H., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. | |
2010-03-15 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. | |
2010-03-15 | Adopted, Ayes 95, Nays 0 | |
2010-03-11 | Intro., placed on H. consent cal. 3/15/10 | |
2010-03-09 | Filed for intro. |