TN HJR0875 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-12 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-12 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Representative Harry Brooks
Title
Representative Harry Brooks
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-05 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-12 | Signed by Governor. | |
2018-04-10 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2018-04-06 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2018-04-06 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Concurred, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar calendar for 4/5/2018 |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Received from House, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2018-03-29 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2018-02-28 | House | Filed for intro. |