TN HJR0858 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-26 - Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-26 - Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Proposes an amendment to Article VI, Section 14 of the Tennessee Constitution to authorize municipal courts to impose civil penalties up to $3,000 for violations of municipal ordinances.
Title
A RESOLUTION to propose an amendment to Article VI, Section 14, of the Constitution of Tennessee, relative to penalties for violations of municipal ordinances.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-26 - House - HOUSE LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee (Y: 10 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-26 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2024-03-26 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2024-03-20 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 3/26/2024 |
2024-03-19 | House | Action def. in Local Government Committee to 3/26/2024 |
2024-03-13 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 3/19/2024 |
2024-03-13 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Local Government Committee |
2024-03-06 | House | Placed on s/c cal Cities & Counties Subcommittee for 3/13/2024 |
2024-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c Cities & Counties Subcommittee |
2024-02-01 | House | Intro., ref. to Local Government Committee |
2024-01-31 | House | Filed for introduction |