TN HJR0817 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-27 - Placed on s/c cal Budget of FW&M for 06/02/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-27 - Placed on s/c cal Budget of FW&M for 06/02/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Adopts "So I'll Just Shine in Tennessee" ("I'm a [any town], Tennessee Nugget") as an official state song.
Title
Adopts "So I'll Just Shine in Tennessee" ("I'm a [any town], Tennessee Nugget") as an official state song.
Sponsors
Rep. Johnny Shaw [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-27 | Placed on s/c cal Budget of FW&M for 06/02/2010 | |
2010-03-10 | Placed Behind the Budget | |
2010-03-03 | Placed on s/c cal Budget of FW&M for 03/10/2010 | |
2010-03-02 | Assigned to s/c Budget of FW&M | |
2010-03-02 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2010-02-24 | Placed on cal. State & Local Government Committee for 03/02/2010 | |
2010-02-23 | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to State & Local Government Committee | |
2010-02-17 | Placed on s/c cal State Government of S&LG for 02/23/2010 | |
2010-02-17 | Assigned to s/c State Government of S&LG | |
2010-02-11 | Intro., ref. to State & Local Government Committee | |
2010-02-10 | Filed for intro. |
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HJR0817&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/HJR0817.pdf |