TN HJR0777 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-02 - Taken off notice for cal. in Education Instruction
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-02 - Taken off notice for cal. in Education Instruction
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Dr. Joe Deweese, English Language Arts and Math Standards Recommendation Committee
Title
A RESOLUTION to confirm the appointment of Dr. Joe Deweese to the standards recommendation committee for English language arts and mathematics.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-02 | House | Taken off notice for cal. in Education Instruction |
2022-02-23 | House | Placed on cal. Education Instruction for 3/2/2022 |
2022-02-14 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-02-10 | House | Intro., ref. to Education Instruction |
2022-02-07 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HJR0777&ga=112 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/112/Bill/HJR0777.pdf |