TN HJR0758 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-23 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-23 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Steve Bowers, Jackson's Man of the Year
Title
Steve Bowers, Jackson's Man of the Year
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-22 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-15 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-15 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-23 | Signed by Governor. | |
2012-03-22 | Transmitted to Governor for his action. | |
2012-03-22 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2012-03-22 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2012-03-22 | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. | |
2012-03-22 | Concurred, Ayes 32, Nays 0 | |
2012-03-20 | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar cal. for 3/22/2012 | |
2012-03-19 | Rcvd. from H., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. | |
2012-03-15 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. | |
2012-03-15 | Adopted, Ayes 94, Nays 0, PNV 1 | |
2012-03-12 | Intro., placed on H. consent cal. 3/15/12 | |
2012-03-09 | Filed for intro. |