TN HJR0754 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-19 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-19 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Pledges support for development of Corridor K highway project.
Title
Pledges support for development of Corridor K highway project.
Sponsors
Rep. Eric Watson [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-04-08 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-06 - Senate - S. FW&M COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-16 - Senate - S. TRANS COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. FW&M Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-06 - Senate - S. FW&M COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-16 - Senate - S. TRANS COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. FW&M Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-19 | Signed by Governor. | |
2010-04-08 | Transmitted to Governor for his action. | |
2010-04-08 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2010-04-08 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2010-04-08 | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. | |
2010-04-08 | Concurred, Ayes 33, Nays 0 | |
2010-04-06 | Placed on Sen. Consent Calendar (2) cal. for 04/08/2010 | |
2010-04-06 | Rec. for concur by S. FW&M Comm ref to: S. Cal. Comm. | |
2010-04-01 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 04/06/2010 | |
2010-03-30 | Action Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 4/6/2010 | |
2010-03-25 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 03/30/2010 | |
2010-03-16 | Rec. for pass; ref to S. FW&M Comm. | |
2010-03-11 | Placed on S. Trans Comm. cal. for 03/16/2010 | |
2010-03-10 | Rcvd. from H., ref. to S. Trans. Comm. | |
2010-03-08 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. | |
2010-03-08 | Adopted as am., Ayes 96, Nays 0 | |
2010-03-08 | H. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - HA0893) | |
2010-03-04 | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/08/10 | |
2010-03-03 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 03/04/2010 | |
2010-03-02 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2010-02-24 | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 03/02/2010 | |
2010-02-24 | Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2010-02-17 | Placed on s/c cal Budget of FW&M for 02/24/2010 | |
2010-02-10 | Assigned to s/c Budget of FW&M | |
2010-02-09 | Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2010-02-03 | Placed on cal. Transportation Committee for 02/09/2010 | |
2010-02-03 | Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to Transportation Committee | |
2010-01-27 | Placed on s/c cal Rural Roads of TR for 02/03/2010 | |
2010-01-27 | Assigned to s/c Rural Roads of TR | |
2010-01-25 | Intro., ref. to Transportation Committee | |
2010-01-21 | Filed for intro. |