TN HJR0737 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-04 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-04 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Christel Griffin
Title
Christel Griffin
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-01-28 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-04 | Signed by Governor. | |
2010-01-28 | Transmitted to Governor for his action. | |
2010-01-28 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2010-01-28 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2010-01-28 | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. | |
2010-01-28 | Concurred, Ayes 31, Nays 0 | |
2010-01-27 | Recd from H., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. | |
2010-01-26 | Placed on Sen. Consent Calendar (1) cal. for 01/28/2010 | |
2010-01-25 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. | |
2010-01-25 | Adopted, Ayes 94, Nays 1 | |
2010-01-25 | R/S H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 1/25/10 | |
2010-01-19 | Filed for intro. |