TN HJR0699 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on February 2 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-02 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on February 2 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-02 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Middle Tennessee Christian School football team, 2023 Tennessee Division II-A state champions
Title
A RESOLUTION to honor and congratulate the Middle Tennessee Christian School football team, TSSAA Division II-A state champions.
Sponsors
Rep. Bryan Terry [R] | Rep. Robert Stevens [R] | Rep. Tim Rudd [R] | Rep. Mike Sparks [R] |
Rep. Charlie Baum [R] | Rep. David Hawk [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-01-29 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-02 | Signed by Governor. | |
2024-01-31 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2024-01-30 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2024-01-30 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Concurred, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2024-01-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar for 1/29/2024 |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Received from House, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2024-01-23 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2024-01-22 | House | Adopted, Ayes 95, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2024-01-22 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-01-10 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 1/17/2024 |
2024-01-10 | House | Objected to on Consent Calendar. |
2024-01-09 | House | Intro., placed on H. consent cal. for 1/10/2024 |
2024-01-03 | House | Filed for introduction |