TN HJR0690 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on January 30 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-01-30 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on January 30 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-01-30 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Chief Warrant Officer 3 Stephen R. Dwyer, Chief Warrant Officer 2 Shane M. Barnes, Staff Sergeant Tanner W. Grone, Sergeant Andrew P. Southard, and Sergeant Cade M. Wolfe
Title
A RESOLUTION to honor the memories of Chief Warrant Officer 3 Stephen R. Dwyer, Chief Warrant Officer 2 Shane M. Barnes, Staff Sergeant Tanner W. Grone, Sergeant Andrew P. Southard, and Sergeant Cade M. Wolfe of the U.S. Army's 160th Special Operations Aviation Regiment.
Sponsors
Rep. Jay Reedy [R] | Rep. Ronnie Glynn [D] | Rep. Ed Butler [R] | Rep. Dave Wright [R] |
Rep. Jerome Moon [R] | Rep. Jeff Burkhart [R] | Rep. Mike Sparks [R] | Rep. Monty Fritts [R] |
Rep. Sam Whitson [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-01-22 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-10 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-10 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-30 | Signed by Governor. | |
2024-01-24 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2024-01-23 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2024-01-23 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2024-01-23 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Concurred, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar for 1/22/2024 |
2024-01-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar for 1/17/2024 |
2024-01-11 | Senate | Received from House, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2024-01-10 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2024-01-10 | House | Adopted, Ayes 89, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2024-01-10 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-01-09 | House | Intro., placed on H. consent cal. for 1/10/2024 |
2023-12-05 | House | Filed for introduction |