TN HJR0679 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-19 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-19 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
"Human Trafficking Awareness Month" in Tennessee, May 2012
Title
"Human Trafficking Awareness Month" in Tennessee, May 2012
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-18 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION MOTION TO CONCUR (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-16 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-10 - Senate - S. JUD COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-19 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-15 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-06 - House - (VOICE VOTE) JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-04-16 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-10 - Senate - S. JUD COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-19 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-15 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-06 - House - (VOICE VOTE) JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-19 | Signed by Governor. | |
2012-04-19 | Transmitted to Governor for his action. | |
2012-04-18 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2012-04-18 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2012-04-18 | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. | |
2012-04-18 | Concurred, Ayes 31, Nays 0 | |
2012-04-18 | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - SA1195) | |
2012-04-16 | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 4/18/2012 | |
2012-04-16 | S. Reset on cal. for 4/18/12 | |
2012-04-12 | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 cal. for 4/16/2012 | |
2012-04-10 | Rec. for concur by S. Comm ref to: S. Cal. Comm. | |
2012-04-04 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 4/10/2012 | |
2012-03-22 | Rcvd. from H., ref. to S. Jud. Comm. | |
2012-03-19 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. | |
2012-03-19 | Adopted as am., Ayes 97, Nays 0 | |
2012-03-19 | H. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - HA0809) | |
2012-03-15 | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/19/2012 | |
2012-03-14 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/15/2012 | |
2012-03-06 | Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2012-02-29 | Placed on cal. Judiciary Committee for 3/6/2012 | |
2012-02-16 | Intro., ref. to Judiciary Committee | |
2012-02-15 | Filed for intro. |