TN HJR0676 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-07 - H. subst. & concurred in SJR 851
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-07 - H. subst. & concurred in SJR 851
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Joelle Phillips, Board of Directors of the Tennessee Education Lottery Corporation
Title
A RESOLUTION to confirm the appointment of Joelle Phillips to the board of directors of the Tennessee education lottery corporation.
Sponsors
Rep. William Lamberth [R] | Rep. Ron Gant [R] | Rep. Kelly Keisling [R] | Rep. Mark White [R] |
Rep. Patsy Hazlewood [R] | Rep. Karen Camper [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-07 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-07 | House | H. subst. & concurred in SJR 851 |
2022-03-07 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-03-03 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-03-03 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 3/7/2022 |
2022-03-02 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/3/2022 |
2022-03-01 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2022-02-23 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 3/1/2022 |
2022-01-25 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-01-19 | House | Intro., ref. to State Government Committee |
2022-01-18 | House | Filed for introduction |