TN HJR0650 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Marion County School District, Marion County Commission, and Marion County Library Board of Trustees
Title
Marion County School District, Marion County Commission, and Marion County Library Board of Trustees
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-02 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR 2 PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR 2 PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-15 | Signed by Governor. | |
2019-05-14 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2019-05-10 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2019-05-10 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Concurred, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Received from House, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar for 5/2/2019 |
2019-05-01 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2019-05-01 | House | Adopted, Ayes 93, Nays 0, PNV 1 |
2019-05-01 | House | Intro., placed on H. consent cal. 2 for 5/1/19 |
2019-05-01 | House | Filed for introduction |