TN HJR0642 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 27 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-27 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 27 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-27 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Jackson County's 34th Annual Polk Sallet Festival, May 10-13, 2012
Title
Jackson County's 34th Annual Polk Sallet Festival, May 10-13, 2012
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-23 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-27 | Signed by Governor. | |
2012-02-23 | Transmitted to Governor for his action. | |
2012-02-23 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2012-02-23 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2012-02-23 | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. | |
2012-02-23 | Concurred, Ayes 32, Nays 0 | |
2012-02-21 | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar cal. for 2/23/2012 | |
2012-02-16 | Rcvd. from H., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. | |
2012-02-13 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. | |
2012-02-13 | Adopted., Ayes 99, Nays 0 | |
2012-02-09 | Intro., placed on H. consent cal. for 2/13/12 | |
2012-02-07 | Filed for intro. |