TN HJR0640 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
John A. Hobbs, 90th birthday
Title
John A. Hobbs, 90th birthday
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-25 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO CONCUR (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-01-24 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-01-24 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-01 | Signed by Governor. | |
2018-01-31 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2018-01-26 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2018-01-26 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Rules Suspended, Concurred, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2018-01-24 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2018-01-24 | House | Adopted, Ayes 99, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2018-01-24 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-01-22 | House | Intro., placed on H. consent cal. for 1-24-18 |
2018-01-19 | House | Filed for intro. |