TN HJR0635 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-31 - Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-31 - Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Designates January 22, 2018, as "Day of Hope and Healing" in Tennessee.
Title
Designates January 22, 2018, as "Day of Hope and Healing" in Tennessee.
Sponsors
Rep. Debra Moody [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-31 | House | Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee |
2018-01-22 | House | Intro., ref. to Health Committee |
2018-01-18 | House | Filed for intro. |
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HJR0635&ga=110 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/110/Bill/HJR0635.pdf |