TN HJR0619 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 68-21)
Status: Passed on May 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-14 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

Pam Beck

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A RESOLUTION to commend Pam Beck on the occasion of her retirement.

Sponsors

Rep. William Lamberth [R]Rep. Mary Littleton [R]Rep. Iris Rudder [R]Rep. Sam Whitson [R]
Rep. Rebecca Alexander [R]Rep. Charlie Baum [R]Rep. Bill Beck [D]Rep. Clark Boyd [R]
Rep. Rush Bricken [R]Rep. Kent Calfee [R]Rep. Scotty Campbell [R]Rep. Karen Camper [D]
Rep. Dale Carr [R]Rep. Michele Carringer [R]Rep. Glen Casada [R]Rep. Scott Cepicky [R]
Rep. Jesse Chism [D]Rep. John Clemmons [D]Rep. Mark Cochran [R]Rep. John Crawford [R]
Rep. Michael Curcio [R]Rep. Tandy Darby [R]Rep. Vincent Dixie [D]Rep. Clay Doggett [R]
Rep. Rick Eldridge [R]Rep. Jeremy Faison [R]Rep. Andrew Farmer [R]Rep. Bob Freeman [D]
Rep. Ron Gant [R]Rep. Johnny Garrett [R]Rep. John Gillespie [R]Rep. Rusty Grills [R]
Rep. Yusuf Hakeem [D]Rep. Curtis Halford [R]Rep. Mark Hall [R]Rep. Torrey Harris [D]
Rep. Kirk Haston [R]Rep. David Hawk [R]Rep. Patsy Hazlewood [R]Rep. Esther Helton [R]
Rep. Gary Hicks [R]Rep. Tim Hicks [R]Rep. Jason Hodges [D]Rep. John Holsclaw [R]
Rep. Dan Howell [R]Rep. Chris Hurt [R]Rep. Darren Jernigan [D]Rep. Curtis Johnson [R]
Rep. Gloria Johnson [D]Rep. Kelly Keisling [R]Rep. Sabi Kumar [R]Rep. Justin Lafferty [R]
Rep. Tom Leatherwood [R]Rep. Harold Love [D]Rep. Susan Lynn [R]Rep. Eddie Mannis [R]
Rep. Pat Marsh [R]Rep. Sam McKenzie [D]Rep. Larry Miller [D]Rep. Bo Mitchell [D]
Rep. Debra Moody [R]Rep. Jerome Moon [R]Rep. Brandon Ogles [R]Rep. Antonio Parkinson [D]
Rep. Jason Powell [D]Rep. Dennis Powers [R]Rep. Bob Ramsey [R]Rep. Jay Reedy [R]
Rep. Tim Rudd [R]Rep. Lowell Russell [R]Rep. Cameron Sexton [R]Rep. Jerry Sexton [R]
Rep. Johnny Shaw [D]Rep. Paul Sherrell [R]Rep. Robin Smith [R]Rep. Mike Sparks [R]
Rep. Mike Stewart [D]Rep. Gregory Terry [R]Rep. Dwayne Thompson [D]Rep. Chris Todd [R]
Rep. Ron Travis [R]Rep. Kevin Vaughan [R]Rep. Todd Warner [R]Rep. Terri Lynn Weaver [R]
Rep. Mark White [R]Rep. Ryan Williams [R]Rep. John Windle [D]Rep. Dave Wright [R]
Rep. Jason Zachary [R]

Roll Calls

2021-05-05 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-14 Signed by Governor.
2021-05-13HouseTransmitted to Governor for his action.
2021-05-13SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2021-05-11HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2021-05-11HouseEnrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
2021-05-05SenateConcurred, Ayes 31, Nays 0
2021-05-04SenatePlaced on Senate Consent Calendar for 5/5/2021
2021-05-04SenateReceived from House, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
2021-05-04HouseEngrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2021-05-04HouseAdopted, Ayes 90, Nays 0, PNV 0
2021-05-03HouseIntro., placed on H. consent cal. for 5/4/21
2021-05-03HouseFiled for introduction

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback