TN HJR0604 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Elizabeth M. "Betty" Tinker
Title
Elizabeth M. "Betty" Tinker
Sponsors
Rep. Roger Kane [R] | Rep. Jimmy Matlock [R] | Rep. Harry Brooks [R] | Rep. Martin Daniel [R] |
Rep. Bill Dunn [R] | Rep. Eddie Smith [R] | Rep. Rick Staples [D] | Rep. Jason Zachary [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-01-25 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-01-18 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-01-18 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-01 | Signed by Governor. | |
2018-01-31 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2018-01-26 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2018-01-26 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Concurred, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar calendar for 1/25/2018 |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Received from House, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2018-01-18 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2018-01-18 | House | Adopted, Ayes 91, Nays 0, PNV 1 |
2018-01-18 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-01-17 | House | Intro., placed on H. consent cal. for 1/18/18 |
2018-01-17 | House | Filed for intro. |