TN HJR0557 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-20 - Received from House, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-20 - Received from House, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
National Drug Endangered Children Awareness Day, April 26, 2023
Title
A RESOLUTION to commemorate April 26, 2023, as "National Drug Endangered Children Awareness Day" in Tennessee.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-19 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-20 | Senate | Received from House, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2023-04-19 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2023-04-19 | House | Adopted, Ayes 96, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2023-04-19 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-04-17 | House | Intro., placed on H. consent cal. for 4/19/23 |
2023-04-17 | House | Filed for introduction |