TN HJR0537 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 22-7)
Status: Passed on May 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-03 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 22-7)
Status: Passed on May 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-03 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Brian Marsh, 2023 President of the Tennessee Road Builders Association
Title
A RESOLUTION to honor and commend Brian Marsh on his election to serve as the 2023 president of the Tennessee Road Builders Association.
Sponsors
Rep. Pat Marsh [R] | Rep. John Clemmons [D] | Rep. Jay Reedy [R] | Rep. Chris Todd [R] |
Rep. Bill Beck [D] | Rep. Jeff Burkhart [R] | Rep. Ed Butler [R] | Rep. Scotty Campbell [R] |
Rep. Karen Camper [D] | Rep. Dale Carr [R] | Rep. Mark Cochran [R] | Rep. Tandy Darby [R] |
Rep. Elaine Davis [R] | Rep. Ronnie Glynn [D] | Rep. Rusty Grills [R] | Rep. Torrey Harris [D] |
Rep. Patsy Hazlewood [R] | Rep. Tim Hicks [R] | Rep. Dan Howell [R] | Rep. Greg Martin [R] |
Rep. Jason Powell [D] | Rep. Dennis Powers [R] | Rep. Tim Rudd [R] | Rep. Lowell Russell [R] |
Rep. Paul Sherrell [R] | Rep. Joe Towns [D] | Rep. Greg Vital [R] | Rep. Sam Whitson [R] |
Rep. Dave Wright [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-20 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-17 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-17 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-03 | Signed by Governor. | |
2023-04-26 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2023-04-25 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2023-04-25 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Concurred, Ayes 30, Nays 0 |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 4/20/2023 |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Received from House, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2023-04-18 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2023-04-17 | House | Adopted, Ayes 93, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2023-04-17 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-04-13 | House | Intro., placed on H. consent cal. 4/17/2023 |
2023-04-11 | House | Filed for introduction |