TN HJR0455 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-09 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-09 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Ruth Holmberg
Title
Ruth Holmberg
Sponsors
Rep. JoAnne Favors [D] | Rep. Patsy Hazlewood [R] | Rep. Marc Gravitt [R] | Rep. Mike Carter [R] |
Rep. Gerald McCormick [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-04 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 88 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 88 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-09 | Signed by Governor. | |
2017-05-08 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2017-05-04 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2017-05-04 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Concurred, Ayes 30, Nays 0 |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar calendar for 5/4/2017 |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Received from House, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2017-04-27 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2017-04-27 | House | Adopted, Ayes 88, Nays 2, PNV 0 |
2017-04-26 | House | Intro., placed on H. consent cal. for 4/27/17 |
2017-04-26 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-04-25 | House | Filed for intro. |