TN HJR0427 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-24 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-24 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Helping Hands and Linking Arms Season of Service
Title
Helping Hands and Linking Arms Season of Service
Sponsors
Rep. Ryan Haynes [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-05-12 - Senate - (VOICE VOTE) FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO CONCUR (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-12 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-12 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-24 | Signed by Governor. | |
2011-05-18 | Transmitted to Governor for his action. | |
2011-05-12 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2011-05-12 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2011-05-12 | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. | |
2011-05-12 | R/S Concurred, v.v. | |
2011-05-12 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. | |
2011-05-12 | Adopted, Ayes 96, Nays 0 | |
2011-05-11 | Intro., placed on H. consent cal. 5/12/11 | |
2011-05-10 | Filed for intro. |