TN HJR0213 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-06 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-06 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Celina K-8 Junior High School basketball team, James C. Haile state champion
Title
Celina K-8 Junior High School basketball team, James C. Haile state champion
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-25 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-06 | Signed by Governor. | |
2019-03-04 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2019-02-27 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2019-02-27 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Concurred, Ayes 30, Nays 0 |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Floor Session calendar for 2/25/2019 |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Received from House, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2019-02-19 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2019-02-18 | House | Adopted, Ayes 95, Nays 0, PNV 1 |
2019-02-14 | House | Intro., placed on H. consent cal. for 2-18-19 |
2019-02-14 | House | Filed for introduction |