TN HJR0176 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-02 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-02 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Franklin Delano McKee, 90th birthday
Title
A RESOLUTION to commend Franklin Delano McKee for his long and honorable service to the State of Tennessee, local governments and people of Tennessee, and the Tennessee valley region as an outstanding public servant as he approaches his ninetieth birthday on May 31, 2023.
Sponsors
Rep. Susan Lynn [R] | Rep. Clark Boyd [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-02-23 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-02 | Signed by Governor. | |
2023-02-27 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2023-02-24 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2023-02-24 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2023-02-24 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Concurred, Ayes 33, Nays 0 |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar for 2/23/2023 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Received from House, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2023-02-14 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2023-02-13 | House | Adopted, Ayes 96, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2023-02-13 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-02-09 | House | Intro., placed on H. consent cal. 2/13/2023 |
2023-02-07 | House | Filed for introduction |