TN HJR0151 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-17 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-17 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Proposes an amendment to Article I, Section 33 of the Constitution of Tennessee to clarify that slavery and involuntary servitude are prohibited in this state, but that duly convicted inmates can work while incarcerated.
Title
Proposes an amendment to Article I, Section 33 of the Constitution of Tennessee to clarify that slavery and involuntary servitude are prohibited in this state, but that duly convicted inmates can work while incarcerated.
Sponsors
Rep. Joe Towns [D] | Rep. Karen Camper [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-17 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2019-04-10 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/17/2019 |
2019-04-10 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2019-04-02 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2019-03-27 | House | Placed on cal. State Committee for 4/2/2019 |
2019-03-26 | House | Action def. in State Committee to 4/2/2019 |
2019-03-20 | House | Placed on cal. State Committee for 3/26/2019 |
2019-03-19 | House | Action def. in State Committee to 3/26/2019 |
2019-03-13 | House | Placed on cal. State Committee for 3/19/2019 |
2019-03-12 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to State Committee |
2019-03-06 | House | Placed on s/c cal Corrections Subcommittee for 3/12/2019 |
2019-02-13 | House | Assigned to s/c Corrections Subcommittee |
2019-02-07 | House | Intro., ref. to State Committee |
2019-02-06 | House | Filed for introduction |