TN HJR0139 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-06 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

Megan Mercereau Huskey, 2013 Sevier County Primary Grades Teacher of the Year

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Megan Mercereau Huskey, 2013 Sevier County Primary Grades Teacher of the Year

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-03-04 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-25 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-03-06SenateSigned by Governor.
2013-03-05SenateTransmitted to Governor for his action.
2013-03-05SenateSigned by S. Speaker
2013-03-05SenateSigned by H. Speaker
2013-03-05SenateEnrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
2013-03-04SenateConcurred, Ayes 31, Nays 0
2013-03-04SenatePlaced on Senate Consent Calendar cal. for 3/4/2013
2013-03-01SenateS. Placed on consent cal. 1 for Monday, 3-4-13
2013-02-28HouseRcvd. from H., ref. to S. Cal. Comm.
2013-02-25HouseEngrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2013-02-25HouseAdopted, Ayes 87, Nays 0
2013-02-21HouseIntro., placed on H. consent cal. for 2/25/13
2013-02-20HouseFiled for intro.

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback