TN HJR0139 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-27 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

Expresses support for people with developmental disabilities having access to home- and community-based services provided through a single distinct entity in state government.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Expresses support for people with developmental disabilities having access to home- and community-based services provided through a single distinct entity in state government.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2009-05-18 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2009-05-27 Signed by Governor.
2009-05-19 Transmitted to Governor for his action.
2009-05-19 Signed by S. Speaker
2009-05-19 Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
2009-05-19 Signed by H. Speaker
2009-05-18 Concurred, Ayes 29, Nays 0
2009-05-14 Placed on Sen. Consent Calendar (2) cal. for 05/18/2009
2009-05-13 Rec. for concur by S. Comm ref to: S. Cal. Comm.
2009-05-11 Placed on S.GW,H&HR Comm. cal. for 05/13/2009
2009-05-11 R/S #83(8) to be heard in S. GW,H&HR Comm. on 05/13/2009
2009-05-07 Rcvd. from H., ref. to S. GW,H&HR Comm.
2009-05-04 Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2009-05-04 Adopted, Ayes 96, Nays 0
2009-04-30 Placed on Consent Calendar for 5/4/2009
2009-04-28 Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 04/30/2009
2009-04-28 Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee
2009-04-22 Placed on cal. Health & Human Resources Committee for 04/28/2009
2009-02-26 Intro., ref. to Health & Human Resources
2009-02-25 Filed for intro.

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback