TN HJR0129 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-12 - H. subst. & concurred in SJR 175
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-12 - H. subst. & concurred in SJR 175
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Madge Cleveland, Heritage Conservation Trust Fund Board
Title
A RESOLUTION to confirm the appointment of Madge Cleveland to the Heritage Conservation Trust Fund Board.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-12 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 91 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-12 | House | H. subst. & concurred in SJR 175 |
2021-04-08 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 4/12/2021 |
2021-04-07 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/8/2021 |
2021-03-31 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2021-03-24 | House | Placed on cal. Agriculture & Natural Resources Committee for 3/31/2021 |
2021-03-03 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-02-24 | House | Intro., ref. to Agriculture & Natural Resources Committee |
2021-02-23 | House | Filed for introduction |