TN HJR0113 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-25 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-25 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Urges department of health to add caregiving and cognitive modules to the 2010 BRFSS.
Title
Urges department of health to add caregiving and cognitive modules to the 2010 BRFSS.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-06-18 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO CONCUR (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-18 - Senate - S. FW&M COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-18 - Senate - S. FW&M COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-25 | Signed by Governor. | |
2009-06-19 | Transmitted to Governor for his action. | |
2009-06-19 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2009-06-19 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2009-06-19 | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. | |
2009-06-18 | Concurred, Ayes 28, Nays 0 | |
2009-06-18 | Placed on Sen. Regular Calendar (2) cal. for 06/18/2009 | |
2009-06-18 | Rec. for concur by S. Comm ref to: S. Cal. Comm. | |
2009-06-18 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 06/18/2009 | |
2009-06-17 | Rcvd. from H., ref. to S. F,W&M Comm. | |
2009-06-16 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. | |
2009-06-16 | Adopted, Ayes 95, Nays 0 | |
2009-06-16 | Placed on Consent Calendar for 6/16/2009 | |
2009-06-16 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 06/16/2009 | |
2009-06-15 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2009-06-15 | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 06/15/2009 | |
2009-06-15 | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2009-06-11 | Placed on s/c cal Budget of FW&M for 06/15/2009 | |
2009-05-27 | Placed Behind the Budget | |
2009-05-20 | Placed on s/c cal Budget of FW&M for 05/27/2009 | |
2009-05-13 | Action Def. in s/c Budget of FW&M to 5/27/2009 | |
2009-05-06 | Placed on s/c cal Budget of FW&M for 05/13/2009 | |
2009-05-06 | Action Def. in s/c Budget of FW&M to 5/13/2009 | |
2009-04-29 | Placed on s/c cal Budget of FW&M for 05/06/2009 | |
2009-04-22 | Action Def. in s/c Budget of FW&M to 5/6/2009 | |
2009-04-15 | Placed on s/c cal Budget of FW&M for 04/22/2009 | |
2009-04-07 | Assigned to s/c Budget of FW&M | |
2009-04-07 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2009-04-01 | Placed on cal. Health & Human Resources Committee for 04/07/2009 | |
2009-02-19 | Intro., ref. to Health & Human Resources | |
2009-02-18 | Filed for intro. |