TN HJR0108 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-05 - H. subst. & concurred in SJR154
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-05 - H. subst. & concurred in SJR154
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Melissa Steagall-Jones, Board of Trustees, East Tennessee State University
Title
A RESOLUTION to confirm the appointment of Melissa Steagall-Jones of Johnson City to the state university board of East Tennessee State University.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-05 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-05 | House | H. subst. & concurred in SJR154 |
2021-04-01 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-04-01 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 4/5/2021 |
2021-03-31 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/1/2021 |
2021-03-24 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2021-03-17 | House | Placed on cal. Education Administration for 3/24/2021 |
2021-03-04 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-02-24 | House | Intro., ref. to Education Administration |
2021-02-23 | House | Filed for introduction |