TN HJR0094 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 39-4)
Status: Enrolled on February 23 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-02-26 - Signed by Senate Speaker
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on February 23 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-02-26 - Signed by Senate Speaker
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Proposes an amendment to Article I, Section 35 of the Constitution of Tennessee to expand the rights of victims of crimes.
Title
A RESOLUTION proposing an amendment to Article I, Section 35 of the Constitution of Tennessee, relative to the rights of crime victims.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-22 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Concur (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for concurrence by Senate Judiciary Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-21 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR MOTION TO ADOPT AS AMENDED (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for concurrence by Senate Judiciary Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-21 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR MOTION TO ADOPT AS AMENDED (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-26 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2024-02-26 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2024-02-23 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Concurred, Ayes 27, Nays 3 |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 2/22/2024 |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Passed Senate on Second Reading |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 2/15/2024 |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Passed Senate on First Reading |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 2/12/2024 |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Recommended for concurrence by Senate Judiciary Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/6/2024 |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Received from House, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2023-04-21 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2023-04-21 | House | Adopted as am., Ayes 92, Nays 0, PNV 1 |
2023-04-21 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-04-20 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/21/2023 |
2023-04-20 | House | Reset on cal. for 4/21/2023 |
2023-04-20 | House | Reset on cal. for 4/20/2023 |
2023-04-20 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0105) |
2023-04-19 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar #2 for 4/20/2023 |
2023-04-18 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar 2 for 4/19/2023 |
2023-04-18 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/18/2023 |
2023-04-18 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2023-04-12 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/18/2023 |
2023-04-12 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2023-04-11 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-04-05 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/12/2023 |
2023-03-15 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee to Constitutional Amendment Calendar |
2023-03-09 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-03-08 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/15/2023 |
2023-03-08 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2023-03-07 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-03-07 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2023-03-02 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-03-01 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 3/7/2023 |
2023-03-01 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-02-28 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2023-02-22 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 2/28/2023 |
2023-02-22 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-02-21 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-02-01 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2023-02-01 | House | Intro., ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2023-01-30 | House | Filed for introduction |