TN HJR0070 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-07 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Local Government of S&LG of State & Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-07 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Local Government of S&LG of State & Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Specifies duties for office of sheriff for all counties.
Title
Specifies duties for office of sheriff for all counties.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-07 | Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Local Government of S&LG of State & Local Government Committee | |
2010-03-31 | Placed on s/c cal Local Government of S&LG for 04/07/2010 | |
2009-05-06 | Action Def. in s/c Local Government of S&LG to 2010 | |
2009-04-29 | Placed on s/c cal Local Government of S&LG for 05/06/2009 | |
2009-03-09 | Assigned to s/c Local Government of S&LG | |
2009-02-12 | Intro., ref. to State & Local Government | |
2009-02-11 | Filed for intro. |
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HJR0070&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/HJR0070.pdf |