TN HJR0056 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 3 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-03 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 3 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-03 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Charley and Priscilla Corvin, 50th wedding anniversary
Title
Charley and Priscilla Corvin, 50th wedding anniversary
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Cobb [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-02-23 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-03 | Signed by Governor. | |
2011-02-23 | Transmitted to Governor for his action. | |
2011-02-23 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2011-02-23 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2011-02-23 | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. | |
2011-02-23 | Concurred, Ayes 31, Nays 0 | |
2011-02-18 | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar cal. for 2/23/2011 | |
2011-02-16 | Rcvd. from H., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. | |
2011-02-14 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. | |
2011-02-14 | Adopted, Ayes 94, Nays 0 | |
2011-02-10 | Intro., placed on H. consent cal. 2/14/11 | |
2011-02-10 | Filed for intro. |