TN HJR0033 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-15 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in: Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-15 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in: Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Requires state board of education to devise and implement methods to encourage secondary school students to complete at least one application to a postsecondary institution.
Title
Requires state board of education to devise and implement methods to encourage secondary school students to complete at least one application to a postsecondary institution.
Sponsors
Rep. Ron Lollar [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-15 | Taken Off Notice For Cal. in: Education Committee | |
2009-04-08 | Placed on cal. Education Committee for 04/15/2009 | |
2009-04-08 | Action Def. in Education Committee to 4/15/2009 | |
2009-04-01 | Placed on cal. Education Committee for 04/08/2009 | |
2009-04-01 | Action Def. in Education Committee to 4/8/2009 | |
2009-03-25 | Placed on cal. Education Committee for 04/01/2009 | |
2009-03-25 | Action Def. in Education Committee to 4/1/2009 | |
2009-03-18 | Placed on cal. Education Committee for 03/25/2009 | |
2009-03-18 | Action Def. in Education Committee to 3/25/2009 | |
2009-03-11 | Placed on cal. Education Committee for 03/18/2009 | |
2009-03-11 | Action Def. in Education Committee to 3/18/2009 | |
2009-03-04 | Placed on cal. Education Committee for 03/11/2009 | |
2009-02-11 | Intro., ref. to Education | |
2009-02-09 | Filed for intro. |
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HJR0033&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/HJR0033.pdf |