TN HJR0011 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 22 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-01-22 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 22 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-01-22 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Calls joint convention for Monday, February 9, 2009, for purpose of hearing budget address and transmittal of the budget.
Title
Calls joint convention for Monday, February 9, 2009, for purpose of hearing budget address and transmittal of the budget.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-01-22 | Signed by Governor. | |
2009-01-16 | Transmitted to Governor for his action. | |
2009-01-15 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2009-01-15 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2009-01-15 | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. | |
2009-01-15 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. | |
2009-01-15 | R/S, Intro. Adopted, Ayes 98, Nays 0 | |
2009-01-15 | Filed for intro. |
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HJR0011&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/HJR0011.pdf |