TN HJR0002 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 7 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-24 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 7 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-24 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Recognizes gaming disorder as a mental health condition.
Title
Recognizes gaming disorder as a mental health condition.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-24 | House | Withdrawn. |
2019-01-23 | House | Assigned to s/c Mental Health & Substance Abuse Subcommittee |
2019-01-10 | House | Ref. to Health |
2019-01-08 | House | Intro. held on desk. |
2018-11-07 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HJR0002&ga=111 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/111/Bill/HJR0002.pdf |