TN HJR0001 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 71-25)
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-02-28 - Received from House, refer to Senate Health & Welfare Committee
Pending: Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

Recognizes teen suicide as a health crisis in Tennessee.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Recognizes teen suicide as a health crisis in Tennessee.

Sponsors

Rep. Rick Staples [D]Rep. Brandon Ogles [R]Rep. Patsy Hazlewood [R]Rep. Mary Littleton [R]
Rep. Iris Rudder [R]Rep. John Clemmons [D]Rep. Michael Curcio [R]Rep. Jason Zachary [R]
Rep. Mark White [R]Rep. Thomas Tillis [R]Rep. Bill Sanderson [R]Rep. Curtis Halford [R]
Rep. Dwayne Thompson [D]Rep. Sam Whitson [R]Rep. Jeremy Faison [R]Rep. Gregory Terry [R]
Rep. Jerome Moon [R]Rep. Gary Hicks [R]Rep. Tom Leatherwood [R]Rep. Esther Helton [R]
Rep. John Crawford [R]Rep. Kirk Haston [R]Rep. Robin Smith [R]Rep. Scott Cepicky [R]
Rep. Susan Lynn [R]Rep. Mike Stewart [D]Rep. Jesse Chism [D]Rep. Rick Eldridge [R]
Rep. Dave Wright [R]Rep. Jason Powell [D]Rep. Karen Camper [D]Rep. Jim Coley [R]
Rep. Dan Howell [R]Rep. Ryan Williams [R]Rep. Mark Hall [R]Rep. Mark Cochran [R]
Rep. Ron Gant [R]Rep. Sabi Kumar [R]Rep. David Byrd [R]Rep. Paul Sherrell [R]
Rep. Jerry Sexton [R]Rep. London Lamar [D]Rep. Yusuf Hakeem [D]Rep. Terri Lynn Weaver [R]
Rep. Chris Hurt [R]Rep. Bill Dunn [R]Rep. John Holsclaw [R]Rep. Curtis Johnson [R]
Rep. Johnny Garrett [R]Rep. Bob Freeman [D]Rep. Clark Boyd [R]Rep. Clay Doggett [R]
Rep. Chris Todd [R]Rep. Antonio Parkinson [D]Rep. Jason Hodges [D]Rep. Martin Daniel [R]
Rep. Justin Lafferty [R]Rep. Jason Potts [D]Rep. Kelly Keisling [R]Rep. Bill Beck [D]
Rep. Dale Carr [R]Rep. Rush Bricken [R]Rep. Vincent Dixie [D]Rep. Charlie Baum [R]
Rep. Kent Calfee [R]Rep. Mike Carter [R]Rep. Glen Casada [R]Rep. Barbara Cooper [D]
Rep. John DeBerry [D]Rep. Andrew Farmer [R]Rep. Bruce Griffey [R]Rep. David Hawk [R]
Rep. Matthew Hill [R]Rep. Timothy Hill [R]Rep. Andy Holt [R]Rep. Bud Hulsey [R]
Rep. Darren Jernigan [D]Rep. Gloria Johnson [D]Rep. William Lamberth [R]Rep. Harold Love [D]
Rep. Larry Miller [D]Rep. Bo Mitchell [D]Rep. Debra Moody [R]Rep. Dennis Powers [R]
Rep. Bob Ramsey [R]Rep. Jay Reedy [R]Rep. Tim Rudd [R]Rep. Lowell Russell [R]
Rep. Cameron Sexton [R]Rep. Johnny Shaw [D]Rep. Mike Sparks [R]Rep. Joe Towns [D]
Rep. Ron Travis [R]Rep. James Van Huss [R]Rep. Kevin Vaughan [R]Rep. John Windle [D]

Roll Calls

2019-02-25 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-28SenateReceived from House, refer to Senate Health & Welfare Committee
2019-02-26HouseEngrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2019-02-25HouseAdopted as am., Ayes 97, Nays 0, PNV 0
2019-02-25HouseAm. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0005)
2019-02-25HouseH. adopted am. (Amendment 2 - HA0006)
2019-02-21HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 2/25/2019
2019-02-20HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 2/21/2019
2019-02-19HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
2019-02-13HousePlaced on cal. Health Committee for 2/19/2019
2019-02-13HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Health Committee
2019-02-06HousePlaced on s/c cal Mental Health & Substance Abuse Subcommittee for 2/13/2019
2019-02-06HouseAction Def. in s/c Mental Health & Substance Abuse Subcommittee to 2/13/2019
2019-01-30HousePlaced on s/c cal Mental Health & Substance Abuse Subcommittee for 2/6/2019
2019-01-23HouseAssigned to s/c Mental Health & Substance Abuse Subcommittee
2019-01-10HouseRef. to Health
2019-01-08HouseIntro. held on desk.
2018-11-07HouseFiled for introduction

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback